Financial history WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £2.45m £2.67m £2.72m £2.74m £2.35m
Total expenditure £2.43m £3.23m £3.35m £4.50m £4.39m
Income from government contracts £1.40m N/A £939.82k £958.00k £1.29m
Income from government grants N/A £939.00k N/A N/A £50.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.00k £24.00k £70.00k £38.00k £4.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.91m £2.15m £2.27m £2.30m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £534.00k £504.00k £372.00k £397.00k £323.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £148.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £20.00k £63.00k £34.00k £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.69m £2.93m £4.11m £4.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.00k £23.00k £251.00k £266.00k £218.00k
Expenditure - Governance £17.00k £17.00k £18.00k £11.00k £74.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £21.00k £23.00k £22.00k £19.00k £22.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £514.00k £174.00k £120.00k £0