Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW ROXBOURNE HARROW
Charity number: 1131727

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV LYNDON PERCIVAL NORTH | Chair | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wilson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Lemar | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Moore | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Orley McIntyre | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Nickolay | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Susan North | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prins Kularajan Mills | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olukemi Olusola Aina | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marita Elizabeth Brown | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HART | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE MCLEOD | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARRY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY DOROTHY GODWIN | Trustee | 18 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.