Financial history STARLIGHT MUSIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1138479
Charity reporting is overdue by 440 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.78k £60.64k £60.72k £4.18k £24.09k
Total expenditure £4.56k £55.22k £65.83k £15.24k £11.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A