Accounts and annual returns STARLIGHT MUSIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1138479
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 March 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 March 2021 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 March 2021 399 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 July 2019 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 July 2019 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required