THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STANDON

Charity number: 1131081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £96.52k £223.05k £136.35k £149.25k £108.89k
Total expenditure £99.94k £354.69k £169.70k £162.55k £96.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A