Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STANDON
Charity number: 1131081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ernest John Chitham | Chair | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Derek William Goodall | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FINDLAY BAKER | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard David Franks | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Susan Geddes | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD BEESTON | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Joan Adamson | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Plummer | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MISS LIZZY FRANKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JOAN GOODALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
A CAROLINE FRANKS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.