THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, STOTFOLD

Charity number: 1131275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNE SCARR Trustee 27 March 2017 None on record
MAUREEN WINTERS Trustee None on record
JENNIFER ANNE CONWAY Trustee 15 May 2017 None on record
Stephen Hardman Trustee 18 April 2016
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD Received: On time
ROE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES Received: On time
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK Received: On time
ROE'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY Received: On time
LYNDA CECILE HAYES Trustee 15 May 2017 None on record
CAROLYN BLEACH Trustee 27 March 2017 None on record
Rev GRAHAM JOHN CLARK Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
Patrick Joseph Partington Harris Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
JANE HYDE Trustee 18 April 2016
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD Received: On time
ROE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES Received: On time
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK Received: On time
ROE'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY Received: On time
Rev Bill Britt Chair 19 January 2015
THE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF WILLIAM FIELD Received: On time
ROE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES Received: On time
H. O. ROE CHARITY Recently registered
ROE'S CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CLERK Received: On time
ROE'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY Received: On time
DAVID BARRIE RIBBANS FCCA Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
MARK DRAPER Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
ANDREA CHRISTINE CHARSLEY Trustee None on record
ALISON BRIDGET COLLIS Trustee 17 January 2013 None on record