BATUS GENERAL FUND

Charity number: 1136176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £966.21k £1.13m £1.07m £734.58k £863.26k
Total expenditure £1.00m £1.13m £1.19m £748.13k £706.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.31k £22.76k £49.54k £6.38k £25.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £587.35k £571.18k
Income - Charitable activities £930.11k £1.82m £961.20k £138.28k £150.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £562 £335 £84.40k £0 £6.39k
Income - Other £12.23k £15.69k £19.44k £2.57k £110.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £894.40k £1.67m £1.00m £725.76k £653.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.70k £18.73k £0 £9.70k £32.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.50k £37.77k £1.15k £12.78k £8.77k
Expenditure - Investment management £6 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £90.65k £119.66k £187.30k £22.38k £53.20k