THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CLEMENT, URMSTON

Charity number: 1131185
Charity reporting is overdue by 331 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £347.81k £107.22k £86.55k £146.95k £114.32k
Total expenditure £373.20k £294.04k £93.91k £130.11k £159.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A