AL-IMAN ARABIC AND SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1133446
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 October 2016 On time Download