THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOLIHULL

Charity number: 1131647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £764.80k £761.99k £754.69k £815.99k £977.05k
Total expenditure £742.94k £744.20k £781.28k £766.65k £857.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £19.24k £17.65k N/A £21.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £398.14k £394.67k £384.52k £422.84k £567.06k
Income - Other trading activities £112.84k £109.38k £92.76k £97.30k £100.35k
Income - Charitable activities £162.52k £168.76k £183.16k £202.91k £214.22k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.30k £89.19k £94.24k £92.94k £95.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.00k £10.25k £1.00k £28.26k £141.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £726.18k £674.38k £716.51k £705.69k £786.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £69.82k £64.77k £60.96k £71.05k
Expenditure - Governance £4.95k £4.95k £5.04k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £27.96k £23.25k £25.93k £29.12k £24.14k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £1.54k £540 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0