THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOLIHULL

Charity number: 1131647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pamela Anne Price Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Lucy Jane Naughton Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
Christopher Barnes Carrington Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Sheila Lesley Sayers Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Alan Keith Wilson Trustee 27 November 2011 None on record
Deirdre Rowena Mary Moll Trustee None on record
Phillipa Joy Gates Trustee None on record
Rev Susan May Chandler Trustee 30 July 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET'S OLTON SOLIHULL CHURCH OLTON SOLIHULL Received: 69 days late
Rev Helen Tean Greenham Trustee 27 November 2011 None on record
Ronald Alan Crowdy FCA Trustee None on record
Rosemary Owens Trustee None on record
Beryl Eileen Moppett MBE BSC Trustee None on record
Andrew Russell Williams MA Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Jaspal Singh Somi BA Hons Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Nicholas Andrew Sturdee Evans BSc Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record
Paul Smith Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record
Vivien Helen Dobson BSc Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record
Merrill Sylvia Flood Trustee 27 November 2011 None on record
Philip Christopher Godfrey Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Malcolm Legard Owens Trustee None on record
Jennifer Deirdre Ladbrooke Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Rachael Marian Linstead BSc PGCE Trustee
THE MURIEL HARDY TRUST Received: On time
Ruth Helen Marshall MA BAHons Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
Timothy John Drakeford Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Susan Gomm Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Jean Carole Fewins Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Rev Simon Hardy Trustee
SOLIHULL CHURCHES ACTION ON HOMELESSNESS Received: On time