CHURCH ON THE ROCK (OLDBURY)

Charity number: 1132952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.20k £10.70k £23.05k £23.05k £13.46k
Total expenditure £7.22k £7.72k £22.57k £22.57k £13.14k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A