Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTHAMSTOW

Charity number: 1132391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Vanessa Caroline Conant Chair 13 July 2015
None on record
Rev Andrew Thomas Stewart Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Alan Charles Moss Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
Michael James Forbes Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Rebecca Veazey-Rao Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Ayobele Dalton Banjo Trustee 23 April 2021
None on record
Timothy Coles Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Natalie Burwell Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rev Dave Edmonson Trustee 17 August 2019
None on record
BRIAN FOXTON Trustee 08 April 2019
ADVENTURE PLUS
Received: On time
Ava Faith Blake Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
Donna Louise Gwilliams Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Helen Davies Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
LAURENCE Anderson JONES Trustee 15 April 2018
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL APPEAL FUND WALTHAMSTOW
Received: On time
LITTLE LEARNERS NURSERY GROUP
Received: On time
Carson Ivan Thompson Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Alex Simpson Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Lynne Rhodes Trustee 25 April 2015
THE MAY ELEANOR MORTON GARDEN OF REMEMBRANCE
Overdue by 90 days
MR WILLIAM DALEY Trustee 25 April 2015
None on record
MARTIN STEPHEN KEARNEY Trustee 13 April 2014
FRIENDS OF HENRY MAYNARD SCHOOL
Received: On time
MR LOU HENDERSON Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE CAROL BAKER Trustee
None on record
Mr Rob Duddridge Trustee
None on record