Financial history THE STROKE CLUB AND BEFRIENDING SERVICE

Charity number: 1137796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.88k £1.16k £1.28k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.57k £1.04k £1.13k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A