Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS OF MYRA, BRIGHTON

Charity number: 1131831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £237.65k £186.18k £138.65k £104.80k £120.57k
Total expenditure £139.68k £168.93k £135.78k £120.61k £113.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.45k N/A N/A N/A