THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, PLAISTOW, BROMLEY, DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER

Charity number: 1132142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £186.65k £162.43k £162.34k £185.43k £189.96k
Total expenditure £137.06k £142.50k £183.95k £233.11k £227.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A