Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, PLAISTOW, BROMLEY, DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER

Charity number: 1132142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ALAN KEELER Chair
18TH BROMLEY (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Clement Llewellyn Sutton Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Anthia Margaret Page Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Lisa Carol Morris Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Suzanne Spooner Trustee 18 May 2021
BULLERS WOOD SCHOOL FOR BOYS SOCIETY
Recently registered
Atlanta Topham Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Merle Jones Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Patricia Frances Boyden Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Rev Alison Ruth Tyler Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Katherine Sand Hevezi Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
JILL ELIZABETH ATKINSON Trustee 01 May 1989
THE EVA WILKINSON MEMORIAL FUND ICW STRATFORD HOUSE SCHOOL
Received: On time
BROMLEY (KENT) FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND SPEECH
Overdue by 83 days