Financial history MARRICK PRIORY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1139240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £494.62k £374.30k £438.43k £407.28k £211.68k
Total expenditure £338.16k £383.21k £387.03k £365.20k £269.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £187.45k