THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHEAM

Charity number: 1134780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Ann Ellen Adams Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Fiona Joy Webster Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
GRAHAM PETER ANDREW Trustee None on record
BRYAN ANTHONY HOPPER Trustee None on record
LAURA MURIEL DRANE Trustee None on record
DIANE PATRICIA HADDOCK Trustee None on record
Claire Susan WINFIELD Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Ian Peter GRAYSTONE Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Austen Lucas Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
JULIA MARGARET HEY Trustee None on record
BARRIE KEITH KINCHINGTON Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST. DUNSTAN'S CHURCH, CHEAM Received: On time
Joanne Louise McCandlish Trustee 17 April 2018
FRIENDS OF ST. DUNSTAN'S CHURCH, CHEAM Received: On time
Thomas Lee Shrimpton Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Gillian Anne GRAYSTONE Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
KAREN JAYNE ADORJAN Trustee None on record
MRS DIAN TAYLOR Trustee 24 April 2012 None on record
Jane Dourado Trustee 24 April 2012
FRIENDS OF ST. DUNSTAN'S CHURCH, CHEAM Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL ROOMS Received: On time
DAVID ASHWOOD DRANE Trustee None on record