THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHEAM

Charity number: 1134780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 December 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 December 2020 35 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 July 2018 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 July 2018 255 days late Download