Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES HILL SUTTON COLDFIELD

Charity number: 1134793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window