Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES HILL SUTTON COLDFIELD
Charity number: 1134793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Leanne Carr | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Richardson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Richardson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Joyce | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Richards | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brown | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Betty Atkins | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Penny | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judy May Stallard | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Harvey Winterbottom | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Evans | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Warren | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cutler | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.