Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CROSTHWAITE, SAINT KENTIGERN, KESWICK

Charity number: 1132320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew Graham Murphie Chair 10 October 2018
BRAITHWAITE CHARITIES
Received: On time
LINDA ELIZABETH RIGG Trustee 18 October 2020
SEEDFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
STOBART NEWLANDS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Rachel Thomas Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Adrian Sturges Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Keith Malcolm Rigg Trustee 10 May 2019
THE CHRISTIAN OUTDOOR PURSUITS TRUST CIO
Recently registered
George Scott Parkinson Trustee 10 May 2018
HAMMARBANK TRUST
Received: On time
Sarah Elizabeth Archer Campion Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
CLAIRE LOUISE WILLIAMS Trustee 01 April 2014
THE FRIENDS OF ST HERBERT'S SCHOOL (KESWICK)
Received: On time
Harriet Ann Sainsbury Spence Trustee 22 April 2012
None on record
Dorothy Fernandez Trustee
UNDERSKIDDAW VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
KESWICK FLOWER CLUB
Received: On time
ALISON DURSTON-SMITH Trustee
None on record
LINDA TEE Trustee
None on record
Mr Chris Pond Trustee
None on record
SARA FRANCES MILLER Trustee
None on record
LAURENCE DURSTON-SMITH Trustee
None on record