Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.ANDREW'S,PRESTON WITH SUTTON POYNTZ

Charity number: 1131901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £88.60k £314.16k £85.27k £87.77k £67.11k
Total expenditure £136.32k £171.42k £156.94k £175.80k £80.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A