Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.ANDREW'S,PRESTON WITH SUTTON POYNTZ

Charity number: 1131901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Kingsley Menzies Chair 20 June 2021
None on record
Trevor Lindley Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Wood Trustee 15 March 2020
THE MOTHERS' UNION (SALISBURY DIOCESE BRANCH)
Received: On time
Caroline Crisp Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
David Hall Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Julie Alison Burton Mrs Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
DAVID GEARY Trustee 12 March 2017
THE ABBEYFIELD (WEYMOUTH) SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Alison Louise Light Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
Sydney Thomas Bateman Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
KENNETH HENRY BARNES JP Trustee 26 April 2015
THE DORSET ASHLAR HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
THERESA MARIE CLAYTON Trustee 19 October 2011
None on record
MRS SHIRLEY JUNE DAVIES Trustee 19 October 2011
None on record
NEVILLE BEECH WOOD Trustee
SUTTON POYNTZ MISSION HALL MANAGEMENT TRUST
Received: On time
JEAN ANNE FAIRBROTHER Trustee
None on record