Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALFEGE, GREENWICH

Charity number: 1133046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £560.00k £449.57k £2.43m £523.04k £382.96k
Total expenditure £347.82k £546.26k £504.41k £1.85m £949.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £175.79k N/A £231.97k £180.85k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £40 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £272.53k N/A £2.06m £204.30k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £111.69k N/A £134.34k £137.85k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £12.57k N/A £64.58k £7.07k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £323.03k N/A £467.32k £1.80m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.79k N/A £37.09k £48.69k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.61k N/A £5.06k £5.04k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £12.53k £9.51k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £24.95k £9.03k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A