THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALFEGE, GREENWICH

Charity number: 1133046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith Thomas Ison Trustee 06 May 2018 None on record
Benjamin Alexander Crompton Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Frances Shaw Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
David McEvoy Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Daisy Smith Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Rev Patricia Ann Mann Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
PETER STEWART KINNISON Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record
Dr NIGEL FRANCIS PERKS MB,BS FRCG Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record
CAROLE MOSES Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record
Evangelia Mitleton-Kelly Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Alison Claire Wood Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
KAREN BELTON Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Dr Irene Bishop CBE Trustee 06 May 2018
CHRIST'S CHAPEL OF GOD'S GIFT AT DULWICH Received: On time
THE DULWICH ESTATE Received: On time
DULWICH COLLEGE Received: On time
MALCOLM DAVID REID Trustee 11 June 2014
GREENWICH CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE AND THE MISSES SMITH Received: On time
Elizabeth Sekweyama Trustee 07 May 2017 None on record
Agnes Jolaoso Trustee 06 May 2018 None on record
WENDY VALERIE FOREMAN Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record
Susan Jane Corneck Trustee 31 October 2017 None on record
JOHN STANLEY Trustee 11 June 2014
MERIDIAN MONEY ADVICE Received: On time
PENN AND WIDOW SMITH ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
Rev Simon Reynolds Winn Chair 23 March 2021 None on record
Deborah Ann Sandringham Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Simon Douglas Ian Gallie Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record
Christine Anne Balls Trustee 07 May 2017 None on record