Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN WITH ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, PADDINGTON
Charity number: 1132885

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN DAVID MASON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adebanke Adeyemo | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shakira Watts | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Isibor-Epega | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Damon Mark Greeney | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Lees | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Stephens | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Georgina Elsey | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Gaynor Scruton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRIS SKARRATT | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN STUART NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MARK GEORGE FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.