Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, LUTON

Charity number: 1132078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £308.85k £334.40k £411.24k £429.21k £200.15k
Total expenditure £298.50k £324.46k £313.02k £681.96k £221.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.10k