Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WADHURST

Charity number: 1132389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £199.68k £196.81k £204.91k £188.76k £226.86k
Total expenditure £219.00k £221.57k £196.57k £197.35k £241.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £3.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £3.00k £11.00k £6.49k