Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, THURNBY, LEICESTER

Charity number: 1133016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £246.80k £244.93k £619.89k £265.13k £238.43k
Total expenditure £247.44k £266.55k £264.69k £194.32k £230.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £18.68k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £585.16k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £10.42k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £13.36k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £10.95k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £256.43k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £2.84k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £5.42k N/A N/A