THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1132925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £194.79k £188.18k £194.01k £168.21k £183.51k
Total expenditure £197.81k £188.48k £212.83k £197.17k £185.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.46k £3.61k £1.00k N/A