THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1132925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Medlycott Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Rev JEREMY MARK FOLLETT Chair None on record
Jacqueline Kennealy Trustee 22 April 2017 None on record
John Sear Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
MICHAEL THOMPSON Trustee 27 September 2020
THE CAPERNWRAY MISSIONARY FELLOWSHIP OF TORCHBEARERS Received: On time
MERIEL DIXON Trustee None on record
Malcolm Blaxland Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Maria Prowse Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
Paul Collis Trustee 27 October 2013 None on record
Rebekah Chafe Trustee 25 April 2015 None on record
Sarah Patrick Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Katherine Kent Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Jonathan Carter Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record