MR BRIGHTSIDE PROJECT

Charity number: 1133615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 October 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2019 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2018 03 January 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2016 04 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2016 Not Required