MR BRIGHTSIDE PROJECT

Charity number: 1133615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/10/2016 04/10/2017 04/10/2018 04/10/2019 04/10/2020
Total gross income £21.37k £16.36k £19.77k £934 £0
Total expenditure £33.70k £30.68k £18.87k £242 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A