THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DURRINGTON DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER

Charity number: 1134809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £122.14k £216.98k £129.91k £129.60k £105.03k
Total expenditure £139.89k £216.77k £113.15k £114.14k £117.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.85k £5.94k