THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DURRINGTON DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER

Charity number: 1134809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynne Noble-Danischevsky Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
Malcolm Brett Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
YVONNE AUSTIN Trustee 18 May 2011 None on record
Carole Nancy Brockhurst Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
MRS VIVIAN MCPHERSON Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
Jane Winter Trustee None on record
Rev Ian Edgar Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Andrew William Griffiths Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
Rev Robert Norbury Chair 03 September 2020 None on record
PETER JOHN MCCALLUM Trustee None on record
Sandra Christine Brett Trustee 21 March 2021 None on record
Diana Smith Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
PAULE MARY HARPER Trustee 18 May 2011 None on record