Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR WESTCLIFF ON SEA

Charity number: 1132331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window