Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR WESTCLIFF ON SEA

Charity number: 1132331

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT PALMER Chair
UNITED KINGDOM TEA TRADE BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
Anne Hammond Trustee 30 April 2021
None on record
Rev Judith Wilkinson Trustee 15 September 2019
None on record
PATRICIA JEAN WHITE Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
ISOBEL LOUISE SMITH Trustee 23 April 2017
SOUTHEND WIND ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Heather Elizabeth Tetchner Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Barry Hayton Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Robert Hammond Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Pamela Collini Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Helen Wall Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
TREVOR RONALD LAWRENCE Trustee
None on record
HILARY CAROLINE HURST Trustee
None on record