THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAELS, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1132915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £225.19k £226.62k £267.60k £261.43k £239.19k
Total expenditure £278.45k £223.90k £247.16k £318.84k £229.65k
Income from government contracts £1.91k £1.98k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.95k