Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH HAMPSTEAD SQUARE

Charity number: 1133781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 November 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 November 2019 19 days late Download Open in new window