Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WATERLOO

Charity number: 1132457
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eileen Margaret Hamilton Trustee 23 April 2023
THE FRIENDS OF ST FRANCIS KATETE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ZAMBIA SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Lydian Bangi Trustee 23 April 2023
OKUSINZA MU LUGANDA
Received: On time
James Anthony Godpower Deeny Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rev Georgia Anne Ashwell Trustee 25 June 2022
WATERLOO PARISH CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew Michael Humphreys Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Alice Mwanje Trustee 15 May 2022
OKUSINZA MU LUGANDA
Received: On time
Maya Sarah Gibbs Conway Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Sean David Galpin Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Robert John Smeath Trustee 16 May 2021
INSPIRE WALWORTH
Received: On time
Alice Kawoya Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Conny Kaweesa Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Concelyn Faye Clinch Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Patricia Eileen Thomas OBE Trustee 26 July 2020
None on record
Elaine Thomas Trustee 26 July 2020
THE BRIDGE AT WATERLOO
Received: On time
AMICABLE SOCIETY'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH CLARSON Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Rev GILES WILLIAM GODDARD Trustee
WATERLOO PARISH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE BRIDGE AT WATERLOO
Received: On time
SOUTHBANK AND WATERLOO NEIGHBOURS
Received: On time
ESTER KAWOYA Trustee
BEACON TRUST
Overdue by 136 days
IDA SERUNJOGI Trustee
None on record
REV GODFREY SAM KAZIRO Trustee
None on record