Financial history KINGDOM MANDATE CENTRE

Charity number: 1141042
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £46.88k £72.60k £41.00k £48.84k £39.81k
Total expenditure £52.42k £69.20k £43.80k £50.04k £45.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A