THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MORTLAKE WITH EAST SHEEN

Charity number: 1132303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £831.96k £597.92k £587.42k £836.16k £585.82k
Total expenditure £594.71k £1.16m £607.83k £575.72k £532.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £706.97k £479.65k £424.83k £717.39k £440.79k
Income - Other trading activities £117.48k £0 £127.40k £111.61k £90.93k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £111.37k £0 £0 £41.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.63k £1.69k £754 £859 £2.87k
Income - Other £4.89k £5.20k £34.44k £879 £9.99k
Income - Legacies £48.62k £12.75k £25.01k £285.00k £22.41k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £574.70k £1.16m £607.68k £575.72k £530.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £154 £149 £0 £489
Expenditure - Governance £20.01k £27.96k £32.71k £39.15k £1.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £29.80k £22.23k £24.90k £25.86k £22.04k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.30k