Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH, WINCHMORE HILL
Charity number: 1133942

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Knight | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Davis | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Katherine Roberts | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Lindsay | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Laurie | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pascale Louis-Louisy | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Prigmore | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Agyekym | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stavros Partou | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Hine | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Athena Foran | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
James McCaghy | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Woodward | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christian Pinnigar | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tania Ceitil Rotherham | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clark | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Whitaker | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Cooke | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Petrides | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Phil Morehen | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Atkins | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Sheldon | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel Paul Sandham | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Ellen Kennelly | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA MARY STANSALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Terence Hey | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.