THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS KENSINGTON

Charity number: 1133985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAMY MANSOUR Trustee 22 April 2018
INTERNATIONAL SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND ADDICTION COALITION Received: On time
Donald Christian Trustee 17 April 2013 None on record
Annabel Lea Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Leah Haynes Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
REV Andy Buckler Chair 28 June 2017 None on record
Stephen Buckley Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Victoire Engome-Eyoum Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Jean-Luc Sergent Trustee 25 September 2017 None on record
Amanda Sharman Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Jonny Simpson Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
NAHEED AMIAKA Trustee 22 April 2018
THE FATHER'S BLESSING Received: On time
HG Miller Trustee 16 March 2015 None on record
Gillian Dandy Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
David Junyung Park Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Stuart Beck Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Antoine Piquet Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record