BRECON MOLO COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1137765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required