BRECON MOLO COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1137765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.37k £18.79k £320 £7.62k £2.27k
Total expenditure £21.12k £20.92k £6.43k £2.32k £7.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.50k £5.50k N/A N/A N/A