Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST CHELTENHAM TEAM MINISTRY

Charity number: 1133887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £329.78k £384.64k £390.87k £291.80k £374.35k
Total expenditure £300.15k £339.32k £348.65k £313.06k £323.07k
Income from government contracts £46.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £45.00k N/A N/A N/A